RI H6137 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Christina Marie Tucciarone to join the Honorable Leonela Felix and Gregory Donald Kowalski in marriage on or about June 12, 2021, within the City of Pawtucket, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (05/04/2021) |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2021) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-03-30 | House | House read and passed |
2021-03-26 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/30/2021) |
2021-03-22 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2021) |
2021-03-17 | House | Introduced, referred to House Special Legislation |