RI H6137 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To The General Assembly (would Provide That The Intersection Of George Waterman Road And Greenville Avenue Located In The Town Of Johnston Would Be Known As The "monsignor Carlo Montecalvo Square")
Title
An Act Relating To The General Assembly (would Provide That The Intersection Of George Waterman Road And Greenville Avenue Located In The Town Of Johnston Would Be Known As The "monsignor Carlo Montecalvo Square")
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-07-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2013-07-01 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2013-07-01 | House | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (07/01/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | House read and passed |
2013-06-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/28/2013) |
2013-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2013-06-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2013) |
2013-05-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2013) |
2013-05-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6137.pdf |