RI H6134 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Provides employer pays any excess damages for an injured minor/clarifies liability of employer for violation of continuation of health care benefits for injured employee caused by employer/repeals obsolete/inapplicable workers' compensation laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' Compensation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-15HouseSigned by Governor
2019-07-11HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-26SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-06-25SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/26/2019)
2019-06-18HouseHouse read and passed
2019-06-14HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/18/2019)
2019-06-12HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-07HouseScheduled for consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-05-29HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019)
2019-05-22HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback