RI H6126 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits a covered establishment from preparing, selling, processing or providing food or beverages in or on a disposable food service container that is composed in whole or in part of polystyrene foam.
Title
Disposable Food Service Containers
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-20 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6126.pdf |