RI H6126 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extends from June 30, 2017 to June 30, 2018, the formula for the distribution of the proceeds of the hotel tax in accordance with the percentages for returns and tax payments received on or before December 31, 2015.
Title
Tourism And Development
Sponsors
Rep. Lauren Carson [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-06-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2017) |
2017-04-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6126.pdf |