RI H6126 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - Meeting postponed (06/24/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-24 - Meeting postponed (06/24/2015)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes loss of use of a rental vehicle as an element of damage in a property liability claim, limited to reasonable expenses for time needed to repair or replace the vehicle, and calculates without regard to fleet utilization reports.
Title
Unfair Claims Settlement Practices Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-24 | House | Meeting postponed (06/24/2015) |
2015-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2015-05-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/05/2015) |
2015-04-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H6126.pdf |