RI H6124 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts active members of the retirement system employed as a state public safety professional and/or a municipal police officer from the cost to purchase credit for military service and interest charges.
Title
Retirement System -- Membership And Service Credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-25 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/27/2021) |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6124.pdf |