RI H6123 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 14 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the "Uniform Fraudulent Transfer Act" to be called the "Uniform Voidable Transactions Act" and amends several provisions to the general laws to reflect this change.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions - Uniform Fraudulent Transfer Act
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Kenneth Marshall [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Jason Knight [D] |
Rep. Joy Hearn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-04-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6123.pdf |