RI H6122 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Making Appropriations For The Support Of The State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2022
Title
Making Appropriations For The Support Of The State For The Fiscal Year Ending June 30, 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 15 (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 1 (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 1 (Y: 10 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 1 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article (Y: 10 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 5 (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 5 (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 14 (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 14 (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 13 (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 13 (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 12 (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 11 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 10 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 9 (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 9 (Y: 10 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 9 (Y: 11 N: 58 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 9 (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 8 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 7 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 7 (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 6 (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 6 (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 4 (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 3 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 3 (Y: 10 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 3 (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 2 (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 2 (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 15 (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 1 (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 1 (Y: 10 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 1 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article (Y: 10 N: 63 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 5 (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 5 (Y: 63 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 14 (Y: 65 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 14 (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 13 (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 13 (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 12 (Y: 73 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 11 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 10 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 9 (Y: 64 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 9 (Y: 10 N: 62 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 9 (Y: 11 N: 58 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 9 (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 8 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 7 (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 7 (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 6 (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 6 (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage: Article 4 (Y: 70 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 3 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 3 (Y: 10 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 3 (Y: 58 N: 10 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage As Amended: Article 2 (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - Passage Of Amendment: Article 2 (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Finance |
2021-06-24 | House | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2021-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2021) |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |