RI H6118 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits school committees from entering into a school bus service contract unless the contract provides for payments to school bus drivers, monitors and aids for one hundred and eighty (180) days or the length of the contracted for school year.
Title
Student Transportation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 8 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-09 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-30 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-29 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-27 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-27 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/29/2021) |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2021) |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |