RI H6116 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows Bennett Schiff to join Taylor Burns and Zachary Lafleur in marriage on or about September 21, 2019, within the Town of Burrillville, Rhode Island.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - Passage *************************** (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-27HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2019-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-19SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-06-18SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/19/2019)
2019-06-18SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2019)
2019-06-13SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2019-06-11HouseHouse read and passed
2019-06-07HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/11/2019)
2019-06-06HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-31HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/06/2019)
2019-05-15HouseIntroduced, referred to House Special Legislation

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback