RI H6112 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Amending The Charter Of The Town Of North Providence (would Amend The Procedures Within The Town Charter Of North Providence Calling For Notice In Accordance With State Laws Or Local Ordinances.)
Title
An Act Amending The Charter Of The Town Of North Providence (would Amend The Procedures Within The Town Charter Of North Providence Calling For Notice In Accordance With State Laws Or Local Ordinances.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
2013-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2013-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2013) |
2013-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2013-06-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2013) |
2013-05-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2013) |
2013-05-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6112.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/HouseText13/H6112A.pdf |