RI H6110 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-18 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs the budget officer to include in the annual state budget and explanation of how the budget furthers efforts to ensure equity in the state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Budget

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-18HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-04-14HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/18/2023)
2023-03-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback