RI H6103 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Block Island utility district to provide utility products and services to the town of New Shoreham.
Title
Block Island Utility District Act Of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-21 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | House passed Sub A |
2017-06-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-24 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/02/2017) |
2017-04-21 | House | Meeting postponed (04/26/2017) |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-04-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |