RI H6103 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

An Act Relating To Domestic Relations - Civil Unions: would provide a legal proceeding whereby two individuals of the same sex may enter into a civil union.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Relating To Domestic Relations - Civil Unions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-02 Signed by Governor
2011-06-29 Transmitted to Governor
2011-06-29 Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence
2011-06-29 Placed on Senate Calendar
2011-06-29 Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence
2011-06-29 Scheduled for consideration
2011-06-02 Committee heard
2011-06-02 Scheduled for hearing
2011-05-25 Referred to Senate Judiciary
2011-05-19 House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2011-05-17 Placed on House Calendar
2011-05-17 Committee recommends passage of Sub A
2011-05-17 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2011-05-11 Committee recommended measure be held for further study
2011-05-11 Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2011-05-03 Introduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback