RI H6102 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An insurer found in violation of the unfair claims settlement practices act can be liable for three (3) times the amount of damages.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Procedure Generally -- Causes Of Action

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08HouseVetoed by Governor
2019-07-03HouseTransmitted to Governor
2019-06-28SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2019-06-28SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019)
2019-06-28SenateCommittee recommends passage in concurrence
2019-06-27SenateScheduled for consideration (06/27/2019)
2019-06-13SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2019-06-13HouseHouse read and passed
2019-06-07HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/13/2019)
2019-05-28HouseCommittee recommends passage
2019-05-24HouseScheduled for consideration (05/28/2019)
2019-05-14HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-10HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/14/2019)
2019-05-10HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback