RI H6096 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that violations of chapter 34 of title 31 pertaining to rental vehicles are civil violations subject to the jurisdiction of the Rhode Island traffic tribunal.
Title
Responsibility Of Owners Of Rental Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-28 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2021) |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-10 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2021) |
2021-06-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |