RI H6093 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits single-family residential zoning in municipalities with populations of over twenty-thousand (20,000) and mandate that those municipalities adopt zoning regulations for middle housing in single-family residential zones.
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/25/2021) |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/18/2021) |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6093.pdf |