RI H6089 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any mayoral academy which is part of a network that seeks to be established or expanded to provide evidence that its attrition rates, special education rates and suspension rates are within acceptable averages.
Title
Mayoral Academies
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6089.pdf |