RI H6088 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-31 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires notice of the reservation of right to a jury trial in an arbitration proceeding be sent by email, delivery receipt requested with certified mail return receipt requested available if party does not have email.
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2021) |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6088.pdf |