RI H6086 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a member of the general assembly who receives any financial payments from any entity or employer seeking legislative approval to file a written recusal.
Title
Code Of Ethics
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2021) |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6086.pdf |