RI H6086 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prevents any state or municipal agency's telecommunications or Internet contractor from collecting and disseminating the personal information of customers.
Title
Relating To Commercial Law--general Regulatory Provisions
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6086.pdf |