RI H6084 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for minimum qualifications for court constable to include education, military, or law enforcement experience and drug and psychological screening.
Title
Procedure Generally -- Writs, Summons And Process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-29 | House | House passed Sub A |
2021-06-25 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/29/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2021-06-23 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2021-06-23 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |