RI H6084 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-15 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for greater school-based management at the school level and expands the duties of school improvement teams and establishes a new chapter on education accountability.
Title
Education Accountability Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] | Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-15 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate Education |
2019-06-26 | House | House passed Sub A |
2019-06-24 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/26/2019) |
2019-06-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2019-06-21 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2019-06-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/24/2019) |
2019-05-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-05-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |