RI H6083 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates guidelines for the family court with respect to the examination of child witnesses in child custody cases and creates a rebuttable presumption of indefinite/permanent alimony for medically disabled spouses married for longer than 10 years.
Title
Divorce And Separation
Sponsors
Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2017) |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6083.pdf |