RI H6073 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of business regulation to provide an equitable distribution of marijuana cultivation or dispensary licenses.
Title
The Edward O. Hawkins And Thomas C. Slater Medical Marijuana Act--the Rhode Island Marijuana Social Equity Program
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6073.pdf |