RI H6073 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Permits the town of Scituate to provide a tax credit to disabled veterans in lieu of a tax exemption.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans' Exemptions--scituate

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-27 - House - Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-11HouseEffective without Governor's signature
2017-10-03HouseTransmitted to Governor
2017-09-19SenateSenate passed in concurrence
2017-09-14SenatePlaced on the Senate Consent Calendar (09/19/2017)
2017-06-27HouseHouse read and passed
2017-06-27HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/27/2017)
2017-06-27HouseCommittee recommends passage
2017-06-24HouseScheduled for consideration (06/27/2017)
2017-04-12HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-04-07HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017)
2017-04-05HouseIntroduced, referred to House Municipal Government

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback