RI H6073 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-06 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the maximum penalties for driving while intoxicated, death resulting, to life imprisonment.
Title
Motor Vehicle Offenses
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/06/2015) |
2015-04-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H6073.pdf |