RI H6065 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits governor's emergency declaration to 60 days unless extended by the general assembly and prohibits eliminating religious exemption regarding mandatory health injections or inoculations and an unlawful employment practice.
Title
Emergency Management
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. George Nardone [R] | Rep. Brian Rea [R] |
Rep. Robert Quattrocchi [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2023) |
2023-03-13 | House | Committee transferred to House State Government & Elections |
2023-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/HouseText23/H6065.pdf |