RI H6064 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Amends the Rhode Island Nonprofit Corporation Act regarding consolidation and merger.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Merger And Consolidation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-01 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09SenateSigned by Governor
2021-07-06SenateTransmitted to Governor
2021-07-01HouseHouse passed Sub A in concurrence
2021-07-01HousePlaced on House Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-07-01SenateSenate passed Sub A
2021-06-29SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (07/01/2021)
2021-06-24SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2021-06-23SenateProposed Substitute
2021-06-22SenateScheduled for consideration (06/24/2021)
2021-06-17SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/17/2021)
2021-06-04SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2021-05-27HouseHouse read and passed
2021-05-21HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/27/2021)
2021-05-11HouseCommittee recommends passage
2021-05-07HouseScheduled for consideration (05/11/2021)
2021-04-05HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2021-04-01HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/05/2021)
2021-03-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Corporations

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback