RI H6062 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the siting and operating standards for farm-based renewable energy facilities.
Title
Farm Conservation And Renewable Energy
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-03-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6062.pdf |