RI H6060 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes a land use calendar within the superior court, effective January 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Superior Court

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-24HouseSigned by Governor
2023-06-19HouseTransmitted to Governor
2023-06-15SenateSenate passed Sub A in concurrence
2023-06-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023)
2023-06-14SenateCommittee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
2023-06-12SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/14/2023)
2023-06-06SenateReferred to Senate Judiciary
2023-05-02HouseHouse passed Sub A
2023-04-28HousePlaced on House Calendar (05/02/2023)
2023-04-25HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2023-04-21HouseProposed Substitute
2023-04-21HouseScheduled for consideration (04/25/2023)
2023-03-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2023-03-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2023)
2023-03-03HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback