RI H6058 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases the amount of allowable units per acre for all projects subject to inclusionary zoning as well as other incentives and subsidies to offset differential costs of below-market units.
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Rep. Marvin Abney [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Nathan Biah [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-15 - Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-24 | House | Signed by Governor |
2023-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-05-25 | House | House passed Sub A |
2023-05-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/25/2023) |
2023-05-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-05-12 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2023-05-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2023) |
2023-03-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2023) |
2023-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |