RI H6054 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a motor vehicle repair shop owner to sell, at a commercially recordable sale, a customer's vehicle if they fail to pay over thirty (30) days of properly charged storage fees.
Title
Motor Vehicle Repair Shop Act
Sponsors
Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Brian Kennedy [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-03 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/07/2019) |
2019-05-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText19/HouseText19/H6054.pdf |