RI H6052 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the Rhode Island teacher of the year as an additional ex officio member of the council on elementary and secondary education as well as the board of education.
Title
Council On Elementary And Secondary Education
Sponsors
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] | Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] | Rep. Susan Donovan [D] | Rep. June Speakman [D] |
Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] | Rep. Tina Spears [D] | Rep. Lauren Carson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-04 - House - Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2023-06-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2023-06-16 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/15/2023) |
2023-05-04 | House | House passed Sub A |
2023-04-28 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/04/2023) |
2023-04-19 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2023-04-14 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2023-04-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/19/2023) |
2023-03-22 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2023-03-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/22/2023) |
2023-03-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Education |