RI H6048 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-21 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 For The Graduate School Of Oceanography Center For Ocean Exploration At The University Of Rhode Island (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $500,000 Dollars For The Graduate School Of Oceanography Center For Ocean Exploration.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $500,000 For The Graduate School Of Oceanography Center For Ocean Exploration At The University Of Rhode Island (authorizes The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $500,000 Dollars For The Graduate School Of Oceanography Center For Ocean Exploration.)
Sponsors
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] |
Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2015-05-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/21/2015) |
2015-04-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText15/HouseText15/H6048.pdf |