RI H6041 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/25/2021)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-19 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/25/2021)
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mandates that any notice to the public required of a municipality be posted in a newspaper that is published on a daily basis and is distributed in that municipality.
Title
Relating To Towns And Cities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/25/2021) |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-03-13 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/18/2021) |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6041.pdf |