RI H6033 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-25 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies existing statutory scheme as it relates to fiscal notes regarding criminal justice and related legislation. Requires the fiscal notes speak to issues of whether the legislation enhances public safety and contains sensible fiscal policy.
Title
Fiscal Notes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-25 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-21 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/25/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6033.pdf |