RI H6028 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/14/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-12 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/14/2021)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the executive office of health and human services to use appropriated funds to support graduate medical education programs and research. At the same time implementing the appropriate payment mechanism in order to make the payments annually.
Title
Graduate Medical Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Withdrawn at sponsor's request (04/14/2021) |
2021-04-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6028.pdf |