RI H6027 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $50,000 For Funding Of The Nonprofit Agency, Inspiring Minds, Inc., To Benefit Providence Elementary School Students (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $50,000 To Inspiring Minds, Inc. To Train Volunteers To Provide Personalized Attention To Providence Elementary School Students.)
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation Of $50,000 For Funding Of The Nonprofit Agency, Inspiring Minds, Inc., To Benefit Providence Elementary School Students (this Resolution Would Authorize The Appropriation Of The Sum Of $50,000 To Inspiring Minds, Inc. To Train Volunteers To Provide Personalized Attention To Providence Elementary School Students.)
Sponsors
Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Jose Batista [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Rebecca Kislak [D] |
Rep. Nathan Biah [D] | Rep. Ramon Perez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-17 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/20/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6027.pdf |