RI H6027 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proves that correctional officers with twenty-five (25) years of service and who are at least fifty-five (55) years of age, shall be entitled to a non-Medicare-eligible retiree health care insurance benefit.
Title
Insurance Benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] |
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2017) |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6027.pdf |