RI H6023 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Makes changes in the definitions of what constitutes unlawful confinement of any sow during gestation, calf raised for veal or egg-laying hen kept on a farm, and would apply them throughout the chapter accordingly.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unlawful Confinement Of A Covered Animal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-15 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-15HouseHouse passed Sub A
2017-06-09HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/15/2017)
2017-06-08HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2017-06-06HouseScheduled for consideration (06/08/2017)
2017-04-07HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2017-03-31HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/06/2017)
2017-03-29HouseIntroduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback