RI H6022 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Gives RIHMFC authority to bring foreclosure petitions after one year from sale of property for taxes if it is foreclosed, not owner occupied or abandoned; changes members of advisory board; exempts RIHMFC owned property from non-utilization tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tax Sales

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-05-24HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/28/2019)
2019-04-24HouseIntroduced, referred to House Finance

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback