RI H6022 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines snow removal contracts between service providers and service receivers and limit liability between them and declare indemnity agreements void as against public policy.
Title
Snow Removal Service Liability Limitation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2017) |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6022.pdf |