RI H6008 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-29 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the department of transportation to establish a schedule of all landscaping and mowing of lawns on state roads, and provide a copy of said schedule to the department of public works in any city or town where the state road is located.
Title
Department Of Transportation
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] | Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] | Rep. Marcia Ranglin-Vassell [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/29/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H6008.pdf |