RI H6008 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-19 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Allows a person appointed as a primary official to be an employee of the United States, of this state, or of any city or town of this state.
Title
Primary Elections
Sponsors
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Robert Jacquard [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-18 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-18 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Signed by Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Senate passed as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-13 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2017-06-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/08/2017) |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-05-18 | House | House passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2017-05-12 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/18/2017) |
2017-05-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2017-05-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2017) |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2017) |
2017-03-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |