RI H6005 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Cesspools: would extend the date a cesspool must be abandoned under the Rhode Island cesspool act from January 1, 2013 to January 1, 2018
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Cesspools
Sponsors
Rep. John Edwards [D] | Rep. Laurence Ehrhardt [R] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] | Rep. Scott Guthrie [D] |
Rep. Patricia Morgan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-13 | Signed by Governor | |
2011-07-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-07-01 | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-30 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-06-30 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2011-06-30 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-27 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-06-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-06-21 | Referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture | |
2011-06-21 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2011-06-14 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-06-14 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2011-06-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-04-14 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2011-04-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-30 | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/HouseText11/H6005.pdf |