RI H6001 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds the administrator of the supreme court as an individual authorized to perform marriages and would clarify that the current administrators of the superior court, family court, district court, or traffic tribunal are empowered to perform marriages.
Title
Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-10 - House - Solemnization Of Marriage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-25 | House | Signed by Governor |
2021-06-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/22/2021) |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2021) |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2021-06-10 | House | House read and passed |
2021-06-04 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/10/2021) |
2021-06-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2021-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/01/2021) |
2021-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |