RI H6001 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-25 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a statutory vehicle for the creation and functioning of workers' cooperatives which are corporations that are owned and democratically governed by their members.
Title
Workers' Cooperatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/25/2017) |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/11/2017) |
2017-04-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2017-03-24 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText17/HouseText17/H6001.pdf |