RI H5999 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all write in candidates to file prior to election a declaration of intent to run for office with the secretary of state. Finally it would require the board of elections to report all votes received by declared write in candidates.
Title
Write-in Votes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-04-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/26/2021) |
2021-03-15 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-03-12 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2021) |
2021-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/HouseText21/H5999.pdf |